Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2033 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2033


 AN ACT
 relating to adoption of a school district grading policy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.0216 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.0216.  DISTRICT GRADING POLICY. A school district
 shall adopt a grading policy, including provisions for the
 assignment of grades on class assignments and examinations, before
 each school year. A district grading policy:
 (1)  must require a classroom teacher to assign a grade
 that reflects the student's relative mastery of an assignment;
 (2)  may not require a classroom teacher to assign a
 minimum grade for an assignment without regard to the student's
 quality of work; and
 (3)  may allow a student a reasonable opportunity to
 make up or redo a class assignment or examination for which the
 student received a failing grade.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010
 school year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2033 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2033 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor