House
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1764
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1695
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1695
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 759
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 759
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|