E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR85
|
Journal Page: 6965
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 85
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6037
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4708
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4708
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4708
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4700
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4194
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1376
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5083
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5083
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3435
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2688
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2101
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2101
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2101
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2101
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2101
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2101
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2101
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1711
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 760
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 760
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|