House | 05/21/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4077 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2617 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2541 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2541 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2541 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2541 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2541 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2541 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2541 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Watson | Journal Page: 2540 |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2540 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2540 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2225 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |