E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate reconsiders concurrence-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6974
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5136
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5136
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 5136
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 5136
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5031
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5031
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1091
|
Journal Page: 5028
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4956
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4672
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4672
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4606
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4606
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4606
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4606
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4600
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4194
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1376
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5083
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
3-Dukes
|
Journal Page: 5086
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5083
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 3435
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3435
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2151
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|