Senate | 05/06/2009 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2090 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in s/c | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1710 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Refer to s/c on Base Realign Closure by Pres | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |