Senate | 06/01/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 5041 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 766 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 766 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |