House | 05/20/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3675 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2442 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2364 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2364 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2364 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2364 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2364 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2364 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2364 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2049 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 767 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 767 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |