House | 05/24/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably as amended | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 3170 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3170 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2196 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3040 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2225 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2169 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2169 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2169 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2169 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2169 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2169 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2169 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 768 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 768 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |