House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4355 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2295 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2295 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1929 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1712 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1640 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1640 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1640 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1640 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1442 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1442 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1442 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Wentworth | Journal Page: 1441 |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1441 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1441 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1140 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 768 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 768 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |