Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2154 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 2154
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 17, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 17, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of certain travel vouchers
 submitted by certain peace officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 660, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 660.2035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 660.2035.  TRAVEL VOUCHERS OF CERTAIN OFFICERS.  (a)  A
 travel voucher submitted by a peace officer for travel authorized
 and required to provide personal protection for an elected official
 or a member of an elected official's family is confidential and not
 subject to disclosure under Chapter 552.
 (b)  Upon request, the governmental body employing a peace
 officer who submits a voucher described in Subsection (a) shall
 summarize the amounts claimed and the corresponding products or
 services purchased as described in the voucher.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to vouchers not disclosed before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *