1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 2169 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the establishment of a smart growth policy work group |
---|
6 | 6 | | and the development of a smart growth policy for this state. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subtitle B, Title 10, Government Code, is |
---|
9 | 9 | | amended by adding Chapter 2060 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | CHAPTER 2060. SMART GROWTH POLICY |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 2060.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "work group" |
---|
12 | 12 | | means the work group on smart growth policy established under this |
---|
13 | 13 | | chapter. |
---|
14 | 14 | | Sec. 2060.002. WORK GROUP ON SMART GROWTH POLICY. (a) The |
---|
15 | 15 | | work group is composed of a representative from the following |
---|
16 | 16 | | agencies appointed by the executive head of the agency: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) the comptroller's office; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (2) the Texas Department of Transportation; |
---|
19 | 19 | | (3) the Texas Department of Housing and Community |
---|
20 | 20 | | Affairs; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (4) the Department of State Health Services; |
---|
22 | 22 | | (5) the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (6) the Texas Workforce Commission; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (7) the General Land Office; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (8) the Office of Rural Community Affairs; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (9) the Railroad Commission of Texas; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (10) the Department of Agriculture; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (11) the Texas Education Agency; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (12) the Texas Water Development Board; and |
---|
30 | 30 | | (13) other state or regional agencies considered |
---|
31 | 31 | | necessary by the co-presiding officers of the work group. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (b) The representatives from the Texas Department of |
---|
33 | 33 | | Transportation, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, and |
---|
34 | 34 | | the Department of State Health Services shall serve as co-presiding |
---|
35 | 35 | | officers of the work group. |
---|
36 | 36 | | (c) The work group shall hold regular meetings. |
---|
37 | 37 | | Sec. 2060.003. DUTIES OF WORK GROUP. (a) The work group |
---|
38 | 38 | | shall collaborate and develop a comprehensive smart growth plan for |
---|
39 | 39 | | the state to prepare for the projected population growth in the |
---|
40 | 40 | | state. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (b) In developing the plan, the work group shall make |
---|
42 | 42 | | recommendations to the legislature for addressing: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) the quality of community life; |
---|
44 | 44 | | (2) the design of municipalities, counties, and |
---|
45 | 45 | | regions; |
---|
46 | 46 | | (3) economic issues; |
---|
47 | 47 | | (4) environmental issues; |
---|
48 | 48 | | (5) health issues; |
---|
49 | 49 | | (6) housing issues; |
---|
50 | 50 | | (7) transportation issues; |
---|
51 | 51 | | (8) mixed land use; |
---|
52 | 52 | | (9) gentrification; |
---|
53 | 53 | | (10) development decisions that are predictable, |
---|
54 | 54 | | fair, and cost-effective; and |
---|
55 | 55 | | (11) the encouragement of community and stakeholder |
---|
56 | 56 | | collaboration in development decisions. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (c) The work group shall coordinate with councils of |
---|
58 | 58 | | government, regional mobility organizations, metropolitan planning |
---|
59 | 59 | | associations, and smart growth experts in the public and private |
---|
60 | 60 | | sectors, including the United States Environmental Protection |
---|
61 | 61 | | Agency and planning departments in other states. |
---|
62 | 62 | | (d) The work group shall solicit and obtain input from |
---|
63 | 63 | | relevant stakeholders. |
---|
64 | 64 | | Sec. 2060.004. REPORT TO LEGISLATURE. Not later than |
---|
65 | 65 | | January 1 of each odd-numbered year, the work group shall submit a |
---|
66 | 66 | | report to the legislature on the smart growth plan and policies |
---|
67 | 67 | | developed by the work group under this chapter. |
---|
68 | 68 | | Sec. 2060.005. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires August 31, |
---|
69 | 69 | | 2013. |
---|
70 | 70 | | SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2009, the executive |
---|
71 | 71 | | head of each agency included on the work group under Chapter 2060, |
---|
72 | 72 | | Government Code, as added by this Act, shall appoint a |
---|
73 | 73 | | representative to the work group on smart growth policy. |
---|
74 | 74 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
75 | 75 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
76 | 76 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
77 | 77 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2169 passed the Senate on |
---|
78 | 78 | | April 16, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
79 | 79 | | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the |
---|
80 | 80 | | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
81 | 81 | | ______________________________ |
---|
82 | 82 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
83 | 83 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2169 passed the House, with |
---|
84 | 84 | | amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 99, |
---|
85 | 85 | | Nays 48, one present not voting. |
---|
86 | 86 | | ______________________________ |
---|
87 | 87 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
88 | 88 | | Approved: |
---|
89 | 89 | | ______________________________ |
---|
90 | 90 | | Date |
---|
91 | 91 | | ______________________________ |
---|
92 | 92 | | Governor |
---|