E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5157 | |
E | 05/29/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4513 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5977 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4137 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4207 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3490 | |
House | 05/26/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4925 | |
House | 05/26/2009 | Record vote | RV#1289 | Journal Page: 4924 |
House | 05/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 4924 | |
House | 05/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4924 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4580 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4580 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4580 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4078 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 3170 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3170 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2673 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2140 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2068 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2068 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2068 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2068 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2068 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2068 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2068 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1874 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |