Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2197 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2197


 AN ACT
 relating to fees paid to a constable for serving civil process.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (d), Section 86.021, Local Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d) Regardless of the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure, all
 civil process may be served by a constable in the constable's county
 or in a county contiguous to the constable's county, except that a
 constable who is a party to or interested in the outcome of a suit
 may not serve any process related to the suit. All civil process
 served by a constable at any time or place is presumed to be served
 in the constable's official capacity if under the law the constable
 may serve that process in the constable's official capacity. A
 constable may not under any circumstances retain a fee paid for
 serving civil process in the constable's official capacity other
 than the constable's regular salary or compensation. Any fee paid
 to a constable for serving civil process in the constable's
 official capacity shall be deposited with the county treasurer of
 the constable's county.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to civil process served by a constable on or after the effective
 date of this Act. Civil process served by a constable before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before that date, and that law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2197 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2197 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor