Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2206 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 2206
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 24, 2009,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 24, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2206 By: Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certification of an educator in Texas who is certified
 in another state or country.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 21.052, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (e), (f), (g), and
 (h) to read as follows:
 (a) The board may issue a certificate to an educator who
 applies for a certificate and:
 (1) holds:
 (A) a degree issued by an institution accredited
 by a regional accrediting agency or group that is recognized by a
 nationally recognized accreditation board; or
 (B) a degree issued by an institution located in
 a foreign country, if the degree is equivalent to a degree described
 by Paragraph (A);
 (2) holds an appropriate certificate or other
 credential issued by another state or country; and
 (3) performs satisfactorily on:
 (A) the examination prescribed under Section
 21.048; or
 (B) if the educator holds a certificate or other
 credential issued by another state or country, an examination
 similar to and at least as rigorous as that described by Paragraph
 (A) administered to the educator under the authority of that state.
 (e)  An educator who receives a certificate as provided by
 Subsection (a) must perform satisfactorily on the examination
 prescribed under Section 21.048 not later than the first
 anniversary of the date the certificate under Subsection (a) was
 issued.
 (f)  The board shall post on the board's Internet website the
 procedures for obtaining a certificate under Subsection (a).
 (g)  The commissioner shall provide guidance to school
 districts that employ an educator certified as provided by
 Subsection (a) on procedures to classify the educator as a highly
 qualified teacher in a manner consistent with the No Child Left
 Behind Act of 2001 (20 U.S.C. Section 6301 et seq.).
 (h)  This subsection applies only to an applicant who holds a
 certificate or other credential issued by another state or country
 in mathematics, science, special education, or bilingual education
 or another subject area that the commissioner determines has a
 shortage of teachers. In any state fiscal year, the board shall
 accept or reject, not later than the 14th day after the date the
 board receives the completed application, at least 90 percent of
 the applications the board receives for a certificate under this
 subsection, and shall accept or reject all completed applications
 the board receives under this subsection not later than the 30th day
 after the date the board receives the completed application.  An
 applicant under this subsection must submit:
 (1)  a letter of good standing from the state or country
 in which the teacher is certified on a form determined by the board;
 (2)  information necessary to complete a national
 criminal history record information review; and
 (3) an application fee as required by the board.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *