Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2217 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2217


 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a judicial district in Harris County
 as the district court for domestic violence cases in that county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 24.112, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (g), (h), (i), (j),
 (k), and (l) to read as follows:
 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (g), the [The]
 provisions of this section apply to the 11th, 55th, 61st, 80th,
 113th, 125th, 127th, 129th, 133rd, 151st, 152nd, 157th, 164th, and
 165th judicial districts.
 (g)  Subsection (h) applies to the 11th, 55th, 61st, 80th,
 113th, 125th, 127th, 129th, 133rd, 151st, 152nd, 157th, 164th,
 165th, 189th, 190th, 215th, 234th, 269th, 270th, 280th, 281st,
 295th, 333rd, and 334th judicial districts.
 (h)  The judges of the district courts listed in Subsection
 (g) by agreement shall designate one of the listed district courts
 as the domestic violence district court for Harris County. In
 designating the domestic violence district court, the judges shall
 give preference to a district court:
 (1)  that has a judicial vacancy at the time of the
 agreement; or
 (2)  for which the sitting judge of the district court
 has not at the time of the agreement announced a candidacy or become
 a candidate in the upcoming election for that judicial office.
 (i)  Subject to any jurisdictional limitations, the district
 court designated under Subsection (h) as the domestic violence
 district court shall give preference to domestic violence cases,
 including cases involving:
 (1)  dating violence, as defined by Section 71.0021,
 Family Code; and
 (2)  family violence, as defined by Section 71.004,
 Family Code.
 (j)  For the purposes of determining the preference the
 designated domestic violence district court is required to give
 cases under Subsection (i):
 (1) a domestic violence case means:
 (A)  an original application for a protective
 order under Title 4, Family Code;
 (B)  an original application for a protective
 order under Title 4, Family Code, that involves both parties and is
 filed concurrently with an original petition under the Family Code;
 and
 (C)  any matter involving custody of a minor child
 if one parent is alleged to have caused the death of another parent
 and there is a history of domestic violence in the parents'
 relationship; and
 (2)  subject to judicial discretion and resources, the
 designated domestic violence district court may also hear divorce
 and custody cases in which:
 (A)  a court has made an affirmative finding of
 family violence involving both parties; or
 (B)  a protective order has been issued under
 Title 4, Family Code, involving both parties.
 (k) The designated domestic violence district court shall:
 (1)  provide timely and efficient access to emergency
 protective orders and other court remedies for persons the court
 determines are victims of domestic violence;
 (2)  integrate victims' services for persons the court
 determines are victims of domestic violence who have a case before
 the court; and
 (3)  promote an informed and consistent court response
 to domestic violence cases to lessen the number of misdemeanors,
 felonies, and fatalities related to domestic violence in Harris
 County.
 (l)  The Harris County district clerk shall create a form and
 establish procedures to transfer a domestic violence case that
 qualifies for preference under this section to the domestic
 violence district court.
 SECTION 2. Not later than October 1, 2009, the judges of the
 district courts listed in Subsection (g), Section 24.112,
 Government Code, as added by this Act, shall by agreement designate
 a listed court as the domestic violence district court for Harris
 County. If the judges fail to designate a domestic violence
 district court on or before October 1, 2009, the local
 administrative judge for the Harris County district courts shall
 designate a domestic violence court not later than October 5, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2217 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2217 passed the House on
 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor