House
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3435
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3435
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2159
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Wentworth
|
Journal Page: 2159
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2159
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2159
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 2158
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Wentworth
|
Journal Page: 2154
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2154
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 793
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 793
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|