House | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3300 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2358 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2251 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2251 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2251 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2251 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2251 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2251 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2250 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Van de Putte | Journal Page: 2246 |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2246 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2246 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1660 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |