E | 05/23/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | ||
E | 05/15/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2442 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3716 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2400 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2442 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2368 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3308 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Record vote | RV#786 | Journal Page: 3308 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3308 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3308 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3276 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3276 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 4336 | Journal Page: 3276 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3175 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2669 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2295 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2295 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1870 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1611 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1398 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1398 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1398 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1397 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1397 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1397 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1397 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1074 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |