Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2228 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 2228


 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of certain state property from the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice to Coryell County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) Not later than November 1, 2009, the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice shall transfer to Coryell County the
 real property described by Subsection (d) of this section.
 (b) Coryell County shall use the property transferred under
 this Act only for a purpose that benefits the public interest of the
 state. If Coryell County no longer uses the property for a purpose
 that benefits the public interest of the state, ownership of the
 property automatically reverts to the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice.
 (c) The Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall transfer
 the property by an appropriate instrument of transfer. The
 instrument of transfer must:
 (1) include a provision that:
 (A) requires Coryell County to use the property
 for a purpose that benefits the public interest of the state; and
 (B) indicates that ownership of the property
 automatically reverts to the Texas Department of Criminal Justice
 if Coryell County no longer uses the property for a purpose that
 benefits the public interest of the state; and
 (2) describe the property to be transferred by metes
 and bounds.
 (d) The real property to which Subsection (a) of this
 section refers is described as follows:
 Field Notes describing a 33.37-acre tract of land in the Henry
 Farley Survey, Abstract Number 352, Coryell County, Texas. Also
 being a portion of a called 117.56-acre tract of land conveyed to
 Texas Department of Criminal Justice - Institutional Division
 (TDCJ), recorded in Volume 579, Page 387 in the Deed Records of
 Coryell County, Texas.
 Beginning at a 5/8" diameter iron pipe found, being the northeast
 corner of said TDCJ tract, the northwest corner of a called First
 Tract (135.41-acres) and in the south line of a called Second Tract
 (217-acres) described in a partition decree (Powell vs. Powell),
 recorded in Volume L, Page 76 in the Civil Minutes, District Court
 Records of Coryell County, Texas, for the northeast corner of the
 herein described tract of land;
 Thence S 24 degrees 20 minutes 00 seconds W - 982.89 feet (BEARING
 BASIS - Deed Call) with the east line of said TDCJ tract, the west
 line of said Powell First Tract, and generally following a wire
 fence to a railroad tie fence post found for an angle point in the
 herein described tract of land;
 Thence S 13 degrees 13 minutes 26 seconds W - 173.89 feet with the
 east line of said TDCJ tract, the west line of said Powell First
 Tract, and generally following a wire fence to a " diameter iron
 rod set with cap (LETH #3879), from which a 6" diameter cedar fence
 post found at the southeast corner of said TDCJ tract bears S 13
 degrees 13 minutes 26 seconds W - 1593.57 feet, for the southeast
 corner in the herein described tract of land;
 Thence N 67 degrees 05 minutes 00 seconds W - 1592.81 feet through
 said TDCJ tract to a " diameter iron rod set with cap (LETH #3879)
 in the west line of said TDCJ tract and in the east line of State
 Farm-To-Market Highway 929 (FM 929), for the southwest corner in
 the herein described tract of land;
 Thence N 18 degrees 24 minutes 39 seconds E - 55.04 feet with the
 west line of said TDCJ tract and the east line of said FM 929 to a
 " diameter iron rod set with cap (LETH #3879) at the beginning of
 a curve to the right for an angle point in the herein described
 tract of land;
 Thence with the west line of said TDCJ tract, the east line of said
 FM 929 and said curve to the right, with a length of 495.28 feet, a
 radius of 914.43 feet, and a chord of N 33 degrees 55 minutes 39
 seconds E, a distance of 489.25 feet to a " diameter iron rod set
 with cap (LETH #3879) at the point of tangency in the east line of
 said FM 929 for an angle point in the herein described tract of
 land;
 Thence N 49 degrees 26 minutes 39 seconds E - 306.77 feet with the
 west line of said TDCJ tract and the east line of said FM 929 to a
 " diameter iron rod set with cap (LETH #3879) at the southwest
 corner of a called Tract Two (1.99-acres) described in an Affidavit
 of Heirship to Martha Wingate, recorded under Instrument Number
 140336 in the Deed Records of Coryell County, Texas, for the
 northwest corner in the herein described tract of land;
 Thence S 81 degrees 16 minutes 39 seconds E - 1404.58 feetwith the
 north line of said TDCJ tract, the south line of said Wingate Tract
 Two, the south line of a called Tract One described in said Wingate
 Affidavit of Heirship, the south line of a called 9.718-acre tract
 conveyed to Martha Wingate, recorded under Instrument Number 130580
 in the Deed Records of Coryell County, Texas, and the south line of
 said Powell Second Tract to the POINT OF BEGINNING and containing
 33.37-acres of land.
 (e) The Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall grant to
 Coryell County certain utility easements to the real property
 described in Subsection (d) of this section. Utility easements
 shall be mutually beneficial and agreed upon by the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice and Coryell County.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2228 passed the Senate on
 May 4, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2228 passed the House on
 May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor