House | 05/11/2009 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | Journal Page: 3170 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3170 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2453 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2096 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1414 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | Journal Page: 794 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 794 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |