Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2232 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Averitt S.B. No. 2232
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 16, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 16, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2232 By: Averitt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sale of glassware and nonalcoholic beverages by
 certain wholesalers and distributors.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 102, Alcoholic Beverage
 Code, is amended by adding Section 102.071 to read as follows:
 Sec. 102.071.  SALE OF GLASSWARE AND NONALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES.
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Branded glassware" means glassware that contains
 the name, emblem, or logo of or any reference to a brand of
 alcoholic beverage.
 (2)  "Unbranded glassware" means glassware that does
 not contain the name, emblem, or logo of or any reference to a brand
 of alcoholic beverage.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Sections 102.04 and 102.07 or any other
 provision of this code, the holder of a wholesaler's permit who is
 primarily engaged in the wholesale sale of distilled spirits and
 wine may sell branded or unbranded glassware to retailers, provided
 that the glassware is not marketed or sold in a manner:
 (1)  to influence a retailer to purchase any quantity
 of alcoholic beverages;
 (2)  to affect the terms by which a retailer may
 purchase alcoholic beverages; or
 (3) that threatens the independence of a retailer.
 (c)  Section 102.32 applies to payment for unbranded
 glassware or glassware bearing the name, emblem, or logo of a brand
 of distilled spirits or wine by the holder of a wholesaler's permit
 under Subsection (b).
 (d)  Sections 61.73 and 102.31 apply to payment for glassware
 bearing the name, emblem, or logo of a brand of malt beverage by the
 holder of a wholesaler's permit or a distributor's license.
 (e)  Section 102.32 applies to payment for a nonalcoholic
 beverage sold by the holder of a wholesaler's permit or a
 distributor's license to a retailer if:
 (1)  the nonalcoholic beverage is produced or sold by a
 manufacturer of alcoholic beverages other than malt beverages; or
 (2)  the name, emblem, logo, or brand of a manufacturer
 of alcoholic beverages other than malt beverages appears on the
 label of the nonalcoholic beverage.
 (f)  Sections 61.73 and 102.31 apply to payment for a
 nonalcoholic beverage sold by the holder of a wholesaler's permit
 or a distributor's license to a retailer if:
 (1)  the nonalcoholic beverage is produced or sold by a
 manufacturer of malt beverages; or
 (2)  the name, emblem, logo, or brand of a manufacturer
 of malt beverages appears on the label of the nonalcoholic
 beverage.
 (g)  For the purposes of Subchapters C and D, the sale, by the
 holder of a distributor's license, of a nonalcoholic beverage
 produced or sold by a manufacturer of malt beverages or that bears
 the name, emblem, logo, or brand of a manufacturer of malt beverages
 is the same as a sale of beer.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *