House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3953 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 2866 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2866 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2431 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1997 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1909 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1909 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1909 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1909 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1909 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1909 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1909 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 795 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 795 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |