House | 05/21/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3953 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2428 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2428 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2008 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1672 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1672 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1672 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1671 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1671 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1671 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1671 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 797 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 797 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |