E
|
05/27/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4093
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2534
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3728
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#875
|
Journal Page: 3728
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3728
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3728
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3712
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3712
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB3799
|
Journal Page: 3712
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1353
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 801
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 801
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|