Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2312 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Averitt S.B. No. 2312
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 15, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 15, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility for funds from the water infrastructure
 fund from the Texas Water Development Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subdivision (1), Section 15.971, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (1) "Eligible political subdivision" means a city,
 county, district, or authority created under Section 52, Article
 III, or Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, including a
 groundwater district with a groundwater management plan certified
 by the board under Section 36.1072, any other political subdivision
 of the state, any interstate compact commission to which the state
 is a party, and any nonprofit water supply corporation created and
 operating under Chapter 67[:
 [(A) a municipality;
 [(B) a county;
 [(C)     a river authority or special law district
 that is listed in Section 9.010(b);
 [(D) a water improvement district;
 [(E) an irrigation district;
 [(F)     a water control and improvement district;
 and
 [(G)     a groundwater district with a groundwater
 management plan certified by the board under Section 36.1072].
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *