1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 2314 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the adoption of rules by the Texas Water Development |
---|
6 | 6 | | Board regarding supplemental funding resulting from federal |
---|
7 | 7 | | economic recovery legislation. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 15.604, Water Code, is |
---|
10 | 10 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (b) The board shall adopt rules specifying the manner in |
---|
12 | 12 | | which any additional state revolving fund hereafter established by |
---|
13 | 13 | | the board, or any capitalization grant under the state water |
---|
14 | 14 | | pollution control revolving fund, the safe drinking water revolving |
---|
15 | 15 | | fund, or any additional state revolving fund, may be used to provide |
---|
16 | 16 | | financial assistance to an eligible applicant [political |
---|
17 | 17 | | subdivisions] for public works. Such rules shall require financial |
---|
18 | 18 | | assistance to be provided for the purpose or purposes and on the |
---|
19 | 19 | | terms authorized by the federal legislation or federal agency |
---|
20 | 20 | | program under which the additional state revolving fund was |
---|
21 | 21 | | established or the capitalization grant was awarded. |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter J, Chapter 15, Water Code, is amended |
---|
23 | 23 | | by adding Section 15.6055 to read as follows: |
---|
24 | 24 | | Sec. 15.6055. RULEMAKING AUTHORITY FOR SPECIAL FEDERAL |
---|
25 | 25 | | CAPITALIZATION GRANTS. (a) The board may adopt rules specifying |
---|
26 | 26 | | the manner in which any special capitalization grant under the |
---|
27 | 27 | | state water pollution control revolving fund, the safe drinking |
---|
28 | 28 | | water revolving fund, or any additional state revolving fund |
---|
29 | 29 | | received as a result of federal economic recovery legislation may |
---|
30 | 30 | | be used to provide financial assistance to an eligible applicant |
---|
31 | 31 | | for public works. The rules must require financial assistance to be |
---|
32 | 32 | | provided for the purpose or purposes, and on the terms authorized |
---|
33 | 33 | | by, the federal legislation or federal agency program under which |
---|
34 | 34 | | the additional state revolving fund was established or the special |
---|
35 | 35 | | capitalization grant was awarded. |
---|
36 | 36 | | (b) If the board determines that it is necessary to adopt |
---|
37 | 37 | | rules to comply with the terms of a special capitalization grant or |
---|
38 | 38 | | other source of federal funding, and that the procedures prescribed |
---|
39 | 39 | | by Subchapter B, Chapter 2001, Government Code, for adopting rules |
---|
40 | 40 | | do not allow for the adoption of the rules in a sufficiently prompt |
---|
41 | 41 | | manner, the procedures prescribed by that subchapter do not apply |
---|
42 | 42 | | to the adoption of the rules. In that case, the board shall: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) post notice of a meeting to adopt rules not later |
---|
44 | 44 | | than 72 hours before the time the meeting is scheduled; and |
---|
45 | 45 | | (2) adopt the necessary rules at the meeting. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (c) The board shall file a rule adopted in the manner |
---|
47 | 47 | | authorized by Subsection (b) and the board's written determinations |
---|
48 | 48 | | made under that subsection in the office of the secretary of state |
---|
49 | 49 | | for publication in the Texas Register in the manner prescribed by |
---|
50 | 50 | | Chapter 2002, Government Code. |
---|
51 | 51 | | (d) Not later than the 180th day after the date rules are |
---|
52 | 52 | | adopted under Subsection (b), the board may readopt or amend the |
---|
53 | 53 | | rules in accordance with the procedures prescribed by Subchapter B, |
---|
54 | 54 | | Chapter 2001, Government Code. If the board does not readopt or |
---|
55 | 55 | | amend the rules in that manner, the rules expire on the 180th day |
---|
56 | 56 | | after the date the rules were adopted under Subsection (b). |
---|
57 | 57 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2011. |
---|
58 | 58 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
59 | 59 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
60 | 60 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
61 | 61 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
62 | 62 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
63 | 63 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
64 | 64 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
65 | 65 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2314 passed the Senate on |
---|
66 | 66 | | April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that |
---|
67 | 67 | | the Senate concurred in House amendment on June 1, 2009, by the |
---|
68 | 68 | | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
69 | 69 | | ______________________________ |
---|
70 | 70 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
71 | 71 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2314 passed the House, with |
---|
72 | 72 | | amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147, |
---|
73 | 73 | | Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
74 | 74 | | ______________________________ |
---|
75 | 75 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
76 | 76 | | Approved: |
---|
77 | 77 | | ______________________________ |
---|
78 | 78 | | Date |
---|
79 | 79 | | ______________________________ |
---|
80 | 80 | | Governor |
---|