House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3444
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2866
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2866
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2433
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1954
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1954
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1954
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1953
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 802
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 802
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|