Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2321 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Averitt S.B. No. 2321
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 15, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 15, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the management of groundwater resources in the state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (c), Section 35.009, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c) The commission shall also give written notice of the
 date, time, place, and purpose of the hearing to each state senator
 and state representative who represents any part of the area
 proposed for designation as a priority groundwater management area
 and the governing body of each county, regional water planning
 group, adjacent groundwater district, municipality, river
 authority, water district, or other entity which supplies public
 drinking water, including each holder of a certificate of
 convenience and necessity issued by the commission, and of each
 irrigation district, located either in whole or in part in the
 priority groundwater management area or proposed priority
 groundwater management area. The notice must be given before the
 30th day preceding the date set for the hearing.
 SECTION 2. Section 36.051, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (c) Vacancies in the office of director shall be filled by
 appointment of the board. If the vacant office is not scheduled for
 election for longer than two years at the time of the appointment,
 the board shall order an election for the unexpired term to be held
 as part of the next regularly scheduled director's election. The
 appointed director's term shall end on qualification of the
 director elected at that election. Vacancies in the office of
 director are subject to Subchapter B, Chapter 201, Election Code.
 (e)  The resignation of a director or a director-elect's
 declination is subject to Subchapter A, Chapter 201, Election Code.
 SECTION 3. Section 36.058, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 36.058. CONFLICTS OF INTEREST. A director of a
 district is subject to the provisions of Chapters [Chapter] 171 and
 176, Local Government Code, relating to the regulation of conflicts
 of officers of local governments.
 SECTION 4. Section 36.111, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A district by rule may establish that the records and
 reports required by the Texas Department of Licensing and
 Regulation under its rules or Chapter 1901, Occupations Code,
 satisfy the requirements of this section.
 SECTION 5. Section 36.112, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 36.112. DRILLERS' LOGS. A district shall require that
 accurate drillers' logs be kept of water wells and that copies of
 drillers' logs and electric logs be filed with the district. A
 district by rule may establish that the drillers' logs required by
 the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation under its rules or
 Chapter 1901, Occupations Code, satisfy the requirements of this
 section.
 SECTION 6. Subsection (b), Section 36.117, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) A district may not require any permit issued by the
 district for:
 (1) a well used solely for domestic use or for
 providing water for livestock or poultry on a tract of land larger
 than 10 acres that is either drilled, completed, or equipped so that
 it is incapable of producing more than 25,000 gallons of
 groundwater a day;
 (2) the drilling of a water well used solely to supply
 water for a rig that is actively engaged in drilling or exploration
 operations for an oil or gas well permitted by the Railroad
 Commission of Texas provided that the person holding the permit is
 responsible for drilling and operating the water well and the well
 is located on the same lease or field associated with the drilling
 rig; [or]
 (3) the drilling of a water well authorized under a
 permit issued by the Railroad Commission of Texas under Chapter
 134, Natural Resources Code, or for production from such a well to
 the extent the withdrawals are required for mining activities
 regardless of any subsequent use of the water; or
 (4)  a monitoring well, as defined by Section 1901.001,
 Occupations Code.
 SECTION 7. Subsection (a), Section 36.157, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) A district may pay all costs and expenses necessarily
 incurred in the creation and organization of a district, including
 legal fees and other incidental expenses, and may reimburse any
 person or governmental entity, including a county, for money
 advanced for these purposes.
 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *