House | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 2428 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2428 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2134 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1700 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1700 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1700 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1699 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1699 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA4 Carona | Journal Page: 1699 |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1699 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1699 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1697 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1697 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1415 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 802 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 802 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |