House
|
05/26/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4987
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1176
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1176
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1176
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 803
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 803
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|