House
|
05/27/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar on 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5144
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5094
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4073
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3952
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2493
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2493
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Shapleigh
|
Journal Page: 2493
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2493
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2493
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2492
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2492
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2387
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2387
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2387
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 805
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 805
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|