House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 1011
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1011
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 807
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 642
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 602
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 602
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 602
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 602
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 602
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 602
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 602
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 438
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 220
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 220
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|