House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2275
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 2253
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2253
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2253
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 220
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 220
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|