House
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3939
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3171
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2186
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2186
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2186
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2186
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Ellis
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ellis
|
Journal Page: 2181
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2181
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2181
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2142
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1997
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 810
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 810
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 738
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|