Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2420 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Deuell S.B. No. 2420
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the location at which a certification examination for
 interpreters for the deaf or hard of hearing may be conducted.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (i), Section 81.007, Human Resources
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (i) The commission shall determine the frequency for
 conducting the interpreter examinations. The commission shall
 conduct the interpreter examinations:
 (1) in a space [Austin at the commission's office or in
 other space owned or leased by the state] that can be obtained free
 of charge; or
 (2) at a facility selected in compliance with Section
 2113.106, Government Code [in other cities in this state in space
 that can be obtained free of charge].
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *