E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4723
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4723
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4195
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1378
|
Journal Page: 5179
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5179
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3493
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4413
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4413
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2713
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2711
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2466
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#875
|
Journal Page: 3724
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3724
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3724
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3713
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Gonzalez Toureilles, Cook, Martinez Fischer, Thompson, Morrison, Bolton, Merritt, Laubenberg, and
|
Journal Page: 3713
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3713
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB2581
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2866
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2866
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2431
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1997
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1910
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|