House | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 3436 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3436 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3172 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2225 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2177 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2177 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2177 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2176 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2176 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2176 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2176 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Uresti | Journal Page: 2172 |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2171 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2171 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1660 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | Journal Page: 813 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 813 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |