Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2454 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Harris S.B. No. 2454
 (In the Senate - Filed March 20, 2009; March 31, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 16, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; April 16, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to preferences of certain district courts in Tarrant
 County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 24.118, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The 17th District Court shall give preference to civil
 matters.
 SECTION 2. Section 24.150, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The 48th District Court shall give preference to civil
 matters.
 SECTION 3. Section 24.169, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The 67th District Court shall give preference to civil
 matters.
 SECTION 4. Section 24.198, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The 96th District Court shall give preference to civil
 matters.
 SECTION 5. Section 24.252, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The 153rd District Court shall give preference to civil
 matters.
 SECTION 6. Section 24.352, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 24.352. 141ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT (TARRANT COUNTY).
 (a) The 141st Judicial District is composed of Tarrant County.
 (b)  The 141st District Court shall give preference to civil
 matters.
 SECTION 7. Section 24.413, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 24.413. 236TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (TARRANT COUNTY).
 (a) The 236th Judicial District is composed of Tarrant County.
 (b)  The 236th District Court shall give preference to civil
 matters.
 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *