E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4975
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5983
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4447
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4447
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4447
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4447
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3192
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1170
|
Journal Page: 4783
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4783
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4783
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4325
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Rose
|
Journal Page: 4326
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4325
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB4761
|
Journal Page: 4325
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2215
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 820
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 820
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|