House | 05/20/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 4216 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 4216 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 4073 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4073 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3801 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2511 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2421 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2421 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2421 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2421 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2420 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2420 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2420 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Uresti | Journal Page: 2419 |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2419 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2419 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 2101 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1712 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |