Senate | 05/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2096 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 885 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |