E | 05/27/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/27/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4093 | |
E | 05/20/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2618 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4216 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2577 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2617 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2537 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Record vote | RV#954 | Journal Page: 3975 |
House | 05/19/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3975 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3975 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3969 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3969 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3175 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2429 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2429 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2216 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1370 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |