Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2505 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 2505


 AN ACT
 relating to safety of children who participate in rodeos.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle A, Title 9, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 768 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 768. CHILDREN PARTICIPATING IN RODEOS
 Sec. 768.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Bull riding helmet" means a rodeo helmet that is
 designed to provide substantial protection for a person's head and
 face during bull riding.
 (2) "Child" means a person under 18 years of age.
 (3)  "Department" means the Department of State Health
 Services.
 (4)  "Executive commissioner" means the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
 (5)  "Protective vest" means protective clothing that
 covers a person's chest and torso to prevent or mitigate injury to
 those areas.
 (6)  "Rodeo" means an exhibition or competition,
 without regard to whether the participants are compensated,
 involving activities related to cowboy skills, including:
 (A)  riding a horse, with or without a saddle,
 with the goal of remaining on the horse while it attempts to throw
 off the rider;
 (B) riding a bull;
 (C)  roping an animal, including roping as part of
 a team;
 (D) wrestling a steer; and
 (E)  riding a horse in a pattern around preset
 barrels or other obstacles.
 Sec. 768.002.  PROTECTIVE GEAR REQUIRED FOR CHILDREN
 ENGAGING IN CERTAIN RODEO ACTIVITIES. (a)  A child may not engage
 in, and a parent or legal guardian of the child may not knowingly or
 recklessly permit the child to engage in, bull riding, including
 engaging in bull riding outside a rodeo for the purpose of
 practicing bull riding, unless the child is wearing a bull riding
 helmet and a protective vest.
 (b)  To satisfy the requirements of this section, a helmet or
 protective vest must meet the standards adopted under Section
 768.004.
 (c)  In a cause of action in which damages are sought for
 injuries or death suffered by a child in connection with bull
 riding, the failure of the child or of the parent or legal guardian
 of the child to comply with this chapter does not constitute
 responsibility causing or contributing to the cause of the child's
 injuries or death for purposes of Chapter 33, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code.
 Sec. 768.003.  RODEOS ASSOCIATED WITH SCHOOL. (a)  This
 section applies only to a primary or secondary school that
 sponsors, promotes, or otherwise is associated with a rodeo in
 which children who attend the school are likely to participate.
 (b)  A primary or secondary school to which this section
 applies shall, before the first rodeo associated with the school in
 each school year, conduct a mandatory educational program on
 safety, including the proper use of protective gear, for children
 planning to participate in the rodeo. The educational program may
 consist of an instructional video, subject to department approval.
 (c)  A child may not participate in a rodeo associated with
 the child's school during a school year unless the child has
 completed the educational program under Subsection (b) not more
 than one year before the first day of the rodeo.
 Sec. 768.004.  RULES. (a)  The executive commissioner by
 rule shall adopt standards for:
 (1) bull riding helmets; and
 (2) protective vests.
 (b)  For purposes of this section, the executive
 commissioner may adopt standards established under federal law or
 adopted by a federal agency or a nationally recognized
 organization.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules
 establishing requirements for the educational program under
 Section 768.003.
 SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies
 only to a rodeo activity that occurs on or after January 1, 2010.
 (b) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt the rules required by Section
 768.004, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later
 than November 1, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2505 passed the Senate on
 May 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2505 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 136,
 Nays 12, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor