1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 2505 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to safety of children who participate in rodeos. |
---|
6 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Subtitle A, Title 9, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
8 | 8 | | amended by adding Chapter 768 to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 9 | | CHAPTER 768. CHILDREN PARTICIPATING IN RODEOS |
---|
10 | 10 | | Sec. 768.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (1) "Bull riding helmet" means a rodeo helmet that is |
---|
12 | 12 | | designed to provide substantial protection for a person's head and |
---|
13 | 13 | | face during bull riding. |
---|
14 | 14 | | (2) "Child" means a person under 18 years of age. |
---|
15 | 15 | | (3) "Department" means the Department of State Health |
---|
16 | 16 | | Services. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (4) "Executive commissioner" means the executive |
---|
18 | 18 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (5) "Protective vest" means protective clothing that |
---|
20 | 20 | | covers a person's chest and torso to prevent or mitigate injury to |
---|
21 | 21 | | those areas. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (6) "Rodeo" means an exhibition or competition, |
---|
23 | 23 | | without regard to whether the participants are compensated, |
---|
24 | 24 | | involving activities related to cowboy skills, including: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (A) riding a horse, with or without a saddle, |
---|
26 | 26 | | with the goal of remaining on the horse while it attempts to throw |
---|
27 | 27 | | off the rider; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (B) riding a bull; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (C) roping an animal, including roping as part of |
---|
30 | 30 | | a team; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (D) wrestling a steer; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (E) riding a horse in a pattern around preset |
---|
33 | 33 | | barrels or other obstacles. |
---|
34 | 34 | | Sec. 768.002. PROTECTIVE GEAR REQUIRED FOR CHILDREN |
---|
35 | 35 | | ENGAGING IN CERTAIN RODEO ACTIVITIES. (a) A child may not engage |
---|
36 | 36 | | in, and a parent or legal guardian of the child may not knowingly or |
---|
37 | 37 | | recklessly permit the child to engage in, bull riding, including |
---|
38 | 38 | | engaging in bull riding outside a rodeo for the purpose of |
---|
39 | 39 | | practicing bull riding, unless the child is wearing a bull riding |
---|
40 | 40 | | helmet and a protective vest. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (b) To satisfy the requirements of this section, a helmet or |
---|
42 | 42 | | protective vest must meet the standards adopted under Section |
---|
43 | 43 | | 768.004. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (c) In a cause of action in which damages are sought for |
---|
45 | 45 | | injuries or death suffered by a child in connection with bull |
---|
46 | 46 | | riding, the failure of the child or of the parent or legal guardian |
---|
47 | 47 | | of the child to comply with this chapter does not constitute |
---|
48 | 48 | | responsibility causing or contributing to the cause of the child's |
---|
49 | 49 | | injuries or death for purposes of Chapter 33, Civil Practice and |
---|
50 | 50 | | Remedies Code. |
---|
51 | 51 | | Sec. 768.003. RODEOS ASSOCIATED WITH SCHOOL. (a) This |
---|
52 | 52 | | section applies only to a primary or secondary school that |
---|
53 | 53 | | sponsors, promotes, or otherwise is associated with a rodeo in |
---|
54 | 54 | | which children who attend the school are likely to participate. |
---|
55 | 55 | | (b) A primary or secondary school to which this section |
---|
56 | 56 | | applies shall, before the first rodeo associated with the school in |
---|
57 | 57 | | each school year, conduct a mandatory educational program on |
---|
58 | 58 | | safety, including the proper use of protective gear, for children |
---|
59 | 59 | | planning to participate in the rodeo. The educational program may |
---|
60 | 60 | | consist of an instructional video, subject to department approval. |
---|
61 | 61 | | (c) A child may not participate in a rodeo associated with |
---|
62 | 62 | | the child's school during a school year unless the child has |
---|
63 | 63 | | completed the educational program under Subsection (b) not more |
---|
64 | 64 | | than one year before the first day of the rodeo. |
---|
65 | 65 | | Sec. 768.004. RULES. (a) The executive commissioner by |
---|
66 | 66 | | rule shall adopt standards for: |
---|
67 | 67 | | (1) bull riding helmets; and |
---|
68 | 68 | | (2) protective vests. |
---|
69 | 69 | | (b) For purposes of this section, the executive |
---|
70 | 70 | | commissioner may adopt standards established under federal law or |
---|
71 | 71 | | adopted by a federal agency or a nationally recognized |
---|
72 | 72 | | organization. |
---|
73 | 73 | | (c) The executive commissioner shall adopt rules |
---|
74 | 74 | | establishing requirements for the educational program under |
---|
75 | 75 | | Section 768.003. |
---|
76 | 76 | | SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies |
---|
77 | 77 | | only to a rodeo activity that occurs on or after January 1, 2010. |
---|
78 | 78 | | (b) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human |
---|
79 | 79 | | Services Commission shall adopt the rules required by Section |
---|
80 | 80 | | 768.004, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later |
---|
81 | 81 | | than November 1, 2009. |
---|
82 | 82 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
83 | 83 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
84 | 84 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
85 | 85 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
86 | 86 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
87 | 87 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
88 | 88 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
89 | 89 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2505 passed the Senate on |
---|
90 | 90 | | May 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the |
---|
91 | 91 | | Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the |
---|
92 | 92 | | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
93 | 93 | | ______________________________ |
---|
94 | 94 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
95 | 95 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2505 passed the House, with |
---|
96 | 96 | | amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 136, |
---|
97 | 97 | | Nays 12, one present not voting. |
---|
98 | 98 | | ______________________________ |
---|
99 | 99 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
100 | 100 | | Approved: |
---|
101 | 101 | | ______________________________ |
---|
102 | 102 | | Date |
---|
103 | 103 | | ______________________________ |
---|
104 | 104 | | Governor |
---|