House | 05/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2540 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 2429 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2429 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2216 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1776 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1018 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |