House | 05/15/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3209 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2358 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2230 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2230 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2230 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2230 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2230 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2230 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2230 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1997 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1113 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1113 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |