House | 05/25/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 4818 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4818 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4353 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2734 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2734 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2734 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2734 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2733 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2733 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2733 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2193 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1223 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1223 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |