E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5158
|
E
|
05/29/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4513
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5977
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4137
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4207
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1362
|
Journal Page: 4982
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4982
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4982
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4639
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4639
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4286
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3678
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1413
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1413
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|