E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5158 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5156 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6968 | |
Senate | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4994 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4512 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 4133 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5145 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Record vote | RV#1376 | Journal Page: 5145 |
House | 05/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 5145 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5145 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 5104 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5104 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/25/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4569 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 4073 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4073 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3719 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2511 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2404 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2404 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2404 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2404 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2404 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2403 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Hegar | Journal Page: 2403 |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2403 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2403 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2403 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2139 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1413 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1413 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1384 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |